HI SB2786 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain areas within Hawaii Public Housing Authority housing projects are closed to the public and amends criminal trespass in the second degree to permit the prosecution of an unauthorized entry or a violation of a written prohibition to enter into the subject housing projects. Clarifies requirements for signage notifying trespassers of illegal entry. Takes effect on 7/1/2035. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 308) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2666) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2359 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - Act 0031, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).