HI SB2779 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that patients be informed of the amount of radiation exposure to the patient prior to obtaining consent to an x-ray or computed tomography scan.
Title
Medical Procedures; X-rays; Computed Tomography Scans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Hemmings). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH will hold a public decision making on 02-22-10 3:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-08-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 2:55pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2652 (Same As) 2010-02-10 - (H) Recommitted to HLT with none voting no and Representative(s) M. Lee, Souki excused.