HI SB2776 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of a citation for specific violations of the motor vehicle repair laws and rules by licensees. Sets forth a process for licensees to contest the citation and provides for the assessment of fines for each violation.
Title
Relating To Citations For Motor Vehicle Repair Violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2349 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - Act 023, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2776&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2776_.HTM |