HI HB2349 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Act 023, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of a citation for specific violations of the motor vehicle repair laws and rules by licensees. Sets forth a process for licensees to contest the citation and provides for the assessment of fines for each violation. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Citations For Motor Vehicle Repair Violations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateAct 023, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
2018-06-06HouseAct 023, on 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
2018-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 706).
2018-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2018-05-03HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 702).
2018-05-01HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18.
2018-04-27HouseThe House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Keohokalole, Choy; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2018-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:30pm in conference room 229.
2018-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2018-04-25SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 2:35PM in conference room 229.
2018-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831).
2018-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Ruderman.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Choy, McDermott.
2018-04-16HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 57
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 709) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3541) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2018-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2018-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-03-09SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to TRE/CPH, WAM.
2018-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 215).
2018-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 656-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2018-02-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Fukumoto, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2018-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2776 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback