HI SB2772 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum monthly foster care basic board rate and foster care maximum difficulty of care rate. Requires Department of Human Services to report to the Legislature prior to 2015 Regular Session on implementation and cost. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Foster Care; Monthly Basic Board Rate; Monthly Difficulty of Care Rate; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-14 1:15PM in conference room 16. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1694 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3