HI SB2768 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state energy office to adopt rules governing a clean fuel standard for alternative fuels in the State. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Greenhouse Gas Emissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 200) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3023) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2158) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:01PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2297 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).