HI SB2767 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the University of Hawaii at Manoa to hire three psychologists and one case manager to provide student mental health services. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
University of Hawaii at Manoa; Students; Mental Health Services; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 242) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2785) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HEA/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2374) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HEA/CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1703 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 11:00AM in Conference Room 329.