HI SB2759 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the instream use of water for traditional and customary kalo cultivation practices from the existing process for disposition of water rights. Recognizes, confirms, and protects traditional and customary and kuleana rights to water, including rights of use, access, delivery, and quality of water. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Disposition Of Water Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-22. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2707) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/AEN/HWN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HWN, WAM/WTL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1768 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Act 027, 05/25/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).