HI SB2753 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture and sale of animal fur products, with certain exceptions. Effective 1/1/21.
Title
Relating To Animal Fur Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1689 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2753&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2753_.HTM |