HI SB2748 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Precludes a taxpayer from utilizing a general excise tax benefit, including exemptions, deductions, lower rates, or income splitting, unless the taxpayer follows all administrative requirements. Creates trust fund liability for revenues collected by a business as a tax recovery.
Title
General Excise Tax; Exemption Requirement; Trust Fund Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-10 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2595 (Same As) 2010-06-01 - (H) Act 155, on 6/1/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 372).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2748&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2748_.htm |