HI HB2595 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - (H) Act 155, on 6/1/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 372).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - (H) Act 155, on 6/1/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 372).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Precludes a taxpayer from using a general excise tax benefit, including exemptions, deductions, lower rates, or income splitting, unless the taxpayer follows all administrative requirements, subject to exemptions. Creates trust liability for revenues collected by a business as a tax recovery whether such amount is separately stated or not. (HB2595 CD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Exemption Requirement; Trust Fund Liability
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | (H) Act 155, on 6/1/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 372). | |
2010-06-01 | (S) Act 155, 6/1/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 613). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Ige . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Marumoto, McKelvey, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 24-10). | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 24-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-10 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-10 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Saturday, 04-10-10 11:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 467). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 531). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Finnegan. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 460) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Bunda, Ige, Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3046) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2786) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto, Pine, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-12-10 4:10PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred to Friday, 02-12-10, 4:10 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-10-10 4:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2748 (Same As) 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.