HI SB2743 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances Hawaii's economy by establishing a Hawaii Sports Commission and attaching it to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to attract, develop, and promote sports and sporting events.
Title
Hawaii Sports Commission; Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-10-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 1:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2590 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2743&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2743_.htm |