HI SB2742 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 229, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 229, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Pacific-Asia institute for resilience and sustainability to provide the structure and opportunity for a new generation of leaders to emerge who possess the ability to address Hawaii and the Pacific-Asia region's risks from natural and man-made hazards and to develop solutions for sustainable economic growth within the region's unique physical and cultural diversity. (CD1)
Title
Pacific-Asia Institute for Resilience and Sustainability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Act 229, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339). |
2014-07-08 | House | Act 229, on 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339). |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 14-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 14-14). |
2014-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Cullen, Choy; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-14 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takai, Cullen Co-Chairs; Choy, Ward Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: English Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1603-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Hashem, Woodson, Ward. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-10 | House | Re-referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 276) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2712) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to TIA, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TIA/HRE, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |