HI SB2703 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the date that services for remuneration were first performed as information to be provided to the child support enforcement agency through the new hire reporting process. Requires employers or unions to provide the appropriate health plan provider a notice of medical support within a certain time frame. (SB2703 HD1)
Title
Child Support Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Belatti, Ito, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Deferred until 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 383). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2454) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Same As) 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 035, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).