HI SB2693 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 142, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 142, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the temporary commission on the thirteenth Festival of Pacific Arts to plan for the Festival of Pacific Arts to be held in Honolulu from 6/11 - 6/27/2020. Effective 7/1/2018. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Festival Of Pacific Arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 142, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 142, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 142-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 142-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Choy; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; English. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: LoPresti, Fukumoto Co-Chairs; Choy, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 520). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1898-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:35PM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1501-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:20AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 269) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2662) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-18 11:45AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |