HI SB2685 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Garcia, Souza voting no (3) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Garcia, Souza voting no (3) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 1/1/2026, establishes judicial procedures to prevent and remedy abusive litigation. Requires the courts to create new forms by 1/1/2025. Requires the Judiciary to provide training to judges by 7/1/2025. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Abusive Litigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Garcia, Souza voting no (3) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Souza. |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2895) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 9:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2657 (Same As) 2024-04-22 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).