HI SB2671 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that mandatory seller disclosures in real estate transactions include identification of residential real properties lying within the sea level rise exposure area. Effective 11/1/2020. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 326) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3186) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPH. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/CPH. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC/CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2384 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5