HI SB2668 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the percentage of the land conservation fund that may be used for costs related to the operation, maintenance, and management of lands acquired by the fund. Increases the maximum dollar amount of the conveyance tax distribution to the land conservation fund. Appropriates funds from the land conservation fund for resource land acquisition. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Land Conservation Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3115) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2650) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on WTL will reconsider its previous decision on 02-03-20 and will hold a public decision making on 02-07-20 1:40PM in conference room 224. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |