HI SB2662 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agreements to purchase geothermal and nonfossil fuel generated electricity to contain provisions that provide independent power producers with compensation for excessive curtailment.
Title
Public Utilities; Geothermal Energy; Nonfossil Fuel Electricity; Curtailment
Sponsors
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2662&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2662_.HTM |