HI SB2661 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes among the department of human services general duties, the provision of health care preventative services to improve wellness, subject to the appropriation of state funds and availability of federal matching assistance.
Title
Department of Human Services; Medicaid; Wellness; Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |