HI SB2658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Access Hawaii Committee Special Fund.
Title
Department of Accounting and General Services; Access Hawaii Committee Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-08-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-05-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 2/1/2010 1:30:00 PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2505 (Same As) 2010-05-12 - (S) Act 101, 5/12/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 559).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2658&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2658_.htm |