HI SB2657 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Act 106, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Act 106, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a contractor that installs a solar energy device to notify the private entity that installation might void the roofing warranties or guarantees. Unless the private entity forgoes the roofing warranty or guarantee, requires a contractor that installs a solar energy device to obtain written approval from the roof manufacturer and follow written instructions for waterproofing roof penetrations from the roof manufacturer. Requires a roofing contractor that waterproofs roof penetrations related to the installation of a solar energy device to honor the roof warranty or guarantee; provided that if either the roofing contractor's guaranty or the roofing manufacturer's warranty is no longer in effect, the contractor who installs the solar energy device and waterproofs the penetrations shall apply the contractor's or lessor's standard labor and workmanship warranty. (CD1)
Title
Solar Energy Device; Warranty; Contractors
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Act 106, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2014-06-23 | House | Act 106, on 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 717). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-29-14. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-14. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 2-14). |
2014-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-25-14 |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 2-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Kawakami, Onishi, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Ihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Ihara, Ruderman, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Lowen, Onishi, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1582-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, Yamane. |
2014-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 939-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-03-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-11-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2518) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-04-14 4:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |