HI SB2653 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Act 044, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Act 044, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for licensure by endorsement for physicians, surgeons, and osteopathic physicians beginning on 12/31/2018. Appropriates moneys. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Chapter 453, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Act 044, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144). |
2018-06-14 | House | Act 044, on 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 157-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 157-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Mizuno, Takumi, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, S. Chang, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:30pm in conference room 229. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, Ruderman, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Mizuno, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 588). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1976-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from IAC/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC/HHS on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to IAC/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 249) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2851) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2059 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to IAC/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6