HI SB2651 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies certain felonies and conditions that will preclude employment, and other felonies and conditions that may preclude employment, at a medical cannabis dispensary. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis Dispensaries.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/LBR, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |