HI SB2650 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the requirement for certain motion picture theater owners and operators to provide open movie captioning for at least two showings per week, one of which has a scheduled start time no earlier than 4:30 p.m. Repeals the requirement to provide an option of personal closed captioning screenings by means of lightweight eyewear. Effective 7/1/2035. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Movie Theaters.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 248) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang, Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2611) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2273) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2520 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).