HI SB2610 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires at least one member of the committee on weights to be a representative of the special education community, such as a special education teacher or the parent of an exceptional child.
Title
Committee on Weights; Special Education; Board of Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2610&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2610_.HTM |