HI SB2605 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to educate the public about issues that affect children's oral health. Authorizes DHS to determine the rates of payment to dentists who provide dental services to QUEST and the QUEST expanded access program participants. Appropriates funds to increase payments for dental services to QUEST and the QUEST expanded access program participants and to establish an electronic system to track data relating to children's dental health. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Oral Health; Dentists; Public Schools; Medicaid; Appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 242) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2770) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kim. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-12 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from HMS/HTH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2346) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 2:25PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH/EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |