HI SB2593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the healthy aging partnership program to further the program's role in improving the health and well-being of Hawaii's kupuna.
Title
Relating To The Healthy Aging Partnership Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1918 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2593&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2593_.HTM |