HI SB2588 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the establishment of four full-time equivalent (4.0 FTE) archaeologist positions and one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) historic preservation specialist position within the State Historic Preservation Division; provided that the State Historic Preservation Division collaborates with the Department of Accounting and General Services. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2697) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Archeologist
DAGS
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Expenditure Ceiling
Historic Preservation Specialist
Positions
SHPD
Archeologist
DAGS
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Expenditure Ceiling
Historic Preservation Specialist
Positions
SHPD