HI SB2583 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 191, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 191, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts non-ceded lands set aside by the governor to the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation from classification as public land. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 191, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 191, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-04-21 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-21-22. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-21-22. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Nakashima, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 631). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1981-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1348-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kong voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 11:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3184) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2536) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |