HI SB2574 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funding to develop the Charles Atherton House and property into a University of Hawaii kupuna center and support the activities of the University of Hawaii UHealthy Hawaii initiative. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 11:45AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HRE/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2799) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/HMS, CPH/WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE/HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2618 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HSH, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5