HI SB2562 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 728).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 728).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits animal owners and their employees from performing any surgical procedures on the owner's animal or animals. Provides a violation for unlicensed practice of veterinary medicine is a misdemeanor subject to a fine of no more than $1,000, or imprisonment of no more than one year, or both. Clarifies that the offense of cruelty to animals in the first degree does not apply to accepted veterinary practices when the practices are performed by a licensed veterinarian. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Veterinary Medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 728). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Richards added as Co-Chair. Senator Keohokalole discharged as Co-Chair. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 686). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 530). |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, Kila voting no (2) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1581-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 338) in amended form (SD 3). |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole, Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-24 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report filed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 2 offered. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 1 withdrawn. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 1 offered. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3000) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2666) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPN deferred the measure until 02-14-24 1:03PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 9:10AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPN, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |