HI SB2560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the $3 million cap on the amount the University of Hawaii system can expend from the University of Hawaii tuition and fees special fund for the University of Hawaii Foundation.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2530 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2560&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2560_.HTM |