HI SB2560 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to AGL/WTL/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to AGL/WTL/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates special fund administered by the Agribusiness Development Corporation (ADC). Authorizes ADC to subdivide agricultural lands and requires establishment of an agriculture subdivision code. Authorizes ADC to issue revenue bonds to acquire certain agricultural lands. Appropriation. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Acquisition of Oahu Agricultural Lands; Agribusiness Development Corporation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AGL/WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2011 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to AGL/WTL/PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2560&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2560_.HTM |