HI SB2558 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Kapolei jobs initiative pilot program that offers incentives to increase the number of businesses willing to establish themselves or open a new location in the Kapolei region. Establishes a tax credit, until 12/31/2023, as part of the Kapolei jobs initiative pilot program and allows the tax credit to be claimed through 12/31/2028.
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee on LBR deferred the measure. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to ETT/LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2659 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2558&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2558_.HTM |