HI SB2548 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of the county liquor commissions and liquor control adjudication boards to submit to annual criminal history record checks. Requires attorneys hired by the liquor commission or liquor control adjudication board to submit to annual criminal background checks. Removes the requirement that the liquor commission appoints and removes an administrator subject to the civil service laws. Makes final decisions by the liquor commission reviewable under chapter 91, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Liquor Commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2413 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2548&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2548_.HTM |