HI SB2545 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes manufacturers of electronic devices to coordinate collection activities for the purpose of recycling electronic devices. Allows manufacturers of electronic devices to be considered to have satisfied its recycling goals by providing only collection service locations for recycling at no cost to the owner in each county and zip code tabulation area with a population greater than twenty-five thousand, under certain circumstances. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Recycling.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2535) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN/JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |