HI SB2542 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning 1/1/2021, exempts medical services provided by physicians and advanced practice registered nurses acting in the capacity of a primary care provider from the general excise tax. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The General Excise Tax Exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2020-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 279) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3045) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-14SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2792) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2228 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback