HI SB2539 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits to implement SolarAPP+ or a functionally equivalent online automated permitting platform that verifies code compliance and issues permits to licensed contractors for solar distributed energy resource systems in real-time by 1/1/2025. Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits in areas served by an investor-owned electric utility to adopt a self-certification process for solar distributed energy resource systems that are not SolarAPP+ compatible. Takes effect 1/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2164) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, CPN/WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2614 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:20PM in Conference Room 329.
Subjects
Building Permits
Online Automated Permitting Platform
Self-Certification Process
Solar Distributed Energy Resource Systems
Online Automated Permitting Platform
Self-Certification Process
Solar Distributed Energy Resource Systems