HI SB2509 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals an exemption to the general excise tax for genetically engineered agricultural products.
Title
Relating To The General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Nishihara; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |