HI SB2506 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the mental health and substance abuse special fund to be used for certain capital improvements. Requires the Department of Health to identify, among other things, capital improvement projects that should be made with moneys from the mental health and substance abuse special fund to improve the continuum of care for behavioral health and submit a report to the Legislature. Repeals on 6/30/2025. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Mental Health And Substance Abuse Special Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 264) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2913) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2777) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |