HI SB2500 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation for the Hawaii Small Business Innovation Research Program, Manufacturing Assistance Program, and Excelerator Program. Establishes and appropriates funds for a working group to develop a strategic plan for a climate innovation technology park to be located at Coconut Island and to recommend other opportunities for the State to invest in technology to combat climate change. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from EDB/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-06-22 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-06-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-06-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/EEP on Monday, 06-22-20 11:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 259) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3376) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 02-28-20 and will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 11:05AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2711) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Climate Innovation Technology Park
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Working Group
Climate Innovation Technology Park
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Working Group