HI SB250 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the attorney general to serve as legal adviser to the board of trustees of the employees' retirement system and repeals the authority of an appointed representative or outside counsel selected by the board to serve as legal advisor.
Title
Relating To The Board Of Trustees Of The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB250 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB989 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4
HB989 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=250&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB250_.HTM |