HI SB2496 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Incrementally phases in elections by mail for the entire State by the 2022 primary election. Assigns responsibilities between the State and counties for expenses related to mail elections for federal, state, and county offices. Specifies the requirements for the distribution, voting, and tabulation of absentee, permanent absentee, and mail in ballots, including specifications for voter service centers to receive the personal delivery of ballots and to accommodate voters with special needs. Repeals the Election Day state holiday. Makes an appropriation. (SB2496 HD1)
Title
Elections by Mail; Election Expenses; Election Day State Holiday; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1290-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2716) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2453) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-16-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |