HI SB2491 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to HEA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to HEA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits RCUH's procurement exemption to contracts that are directly related to research, contracts for investigations, training, and studies that are directly related to research.
Title
Research Corporation of the University of Hawaii; Procurement Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HEA/GVO, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2491&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2491_.HTM |