HI SB2475 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 029, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 029, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a contractor licensee who aids and abets an unlicensed contractor may be subject to additional discipline by the contractors license board.
Title
Contractors; Licensees; Aiding and Abetting; Discipline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 029, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 029, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 509). |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-17-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-14. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 64). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN/JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2583 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2475&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2475_.HTM |