HI SB2469 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 191, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 683).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 191, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 683).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from the emergency and budget reserve fund to maintain levels of programs for education, human services, and health. Effective July 1, 2010. (CD1)
Title
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 191, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 683). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 191, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 445). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 632). | |
2010-04-28 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 651). | |
2010-04-28 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Takamine. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-28-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 158-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-28-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 158-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Yamane, M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ige, Taniguchi, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-10 2:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Yamane, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; M. Lee, Shimabukuro, Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Taniguchi, Kim, Co-Chair(s); Ihara. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Sagum. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Carroll, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-11-10 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2586) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from HMS/HTH/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deferred the measure until 02-08-10 10:00am in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-05-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 2:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH/JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |