HI SB2464 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - (S) Referred to EDT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - (S) Referred to EDT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax credit of one hundred percent of the first $10,000 of wages, as shown on a W-2 wage and tax statement, and paid to an individual as a qualified production cost incurred by a qualified production in any county of the State; applies to qualified production costs incurred on or after 1/1/2012, and before 1/1/2016; repeals on 1/1/2016.
Title
Taxation; Film and Digital Media; Wage Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2464 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2464_.HTM |