HI SB246 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB246

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a state government realignment commission to periodically review the state executive branch's departments, divisions, and agencies, including functions and services, and submit its findings and recommendations to the legislature. Appropriates American Rescue Plan Act funds for various broadband infrastructure installation and updates throughout the State and requires an annual report regarding these projects. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-04-23SenateReceived notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 627).
2021-04-22HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2021-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 5:00PM; CR 016.
2021-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 10:30AM; CR 016.
2021-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:10AM; CR 016.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Ichiyama, Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward.
2021-04-16HouseRe-referred to GVR, PDP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Rhoads, Wakai Co-Chairs.
2021-04-15SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 505).
2021-04-13HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
2021-04-09HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1842) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-07HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-04-05HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-24HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from GVO/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; 016 & Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateRe-Referred to GVO/JDC, WAM.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to GVO, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB246 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 627).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback