HI SB246 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-06 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that an affidavit on application for voter registration shall be a part of the application associated with the issuance of a civil identification card and driver's license. Requires each county examiner of drivers to electronically store the contents of the affidavit on application for voter registration provided by applicants in conjunction with their driver's license and civil identification card applications and provide electronic accessibility of this information. Effective 1/1/2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06SenateThe committee on TRE deferred the measure.
2017-02-06SenateThe committee on JDL deferred the measure.
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDL/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to JDL/TRE, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1188 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback